Global Patent Index - EP 1087965 A1

EP 1087965 A1 2001-04-04 - THIENYLALKYLAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES AND THE USE THEREOF AS HERBICIDES

Title (en)

THIENYLALKYLAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES AND THE USE THEREOF AS HERBICIDES

Title (de)

THIENYLALKYLAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE

Title (fr)

THIENYLALKYLAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES ET LEURS UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES

Publication

EP 1087965 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919148 A

Priority

  • DE 19816055 A
  • EP 9902089 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19816055A1] The invention relates to novel thienylalkylamino-1,3,5-triazines of general formula (I), wherein A, R<1>, R<2>, R<3>, R<4>, R<5> and Z have the meanings cited in the description. The invention also relates to a method for the production and use thereof as herbicides. The invention further relates to novel intermediate products and the use thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 409/12; A01N 43/10; A01N 43/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/68 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 409/12 (2013.01); A01N 43/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952904A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816055 A1 19991014; AU 3702799 A 19991101; AU 743810 B2 20020207; BR 9909913 A 20001226; CA 2327793 A1 19991021; CN 1162426 C 20040818; CN 1296484 A 20010523; EP 1087965 A1 20010404; JP 2002511468 A 20020416; MX PA00009827 A 20020508; US 6420313 B1 20020716; WO 9952904 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE K.K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIHON BAYER AGROCHEM K.K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER AGROCHEM K.K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL