Global Patent Index - EP 1087978 A1

EP 1087978 A1 2001-04-04 - USE OF DIAZEPINS FOR PREPARING MEDICINES FOR TREATING PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS OR DISEASES INVOLVING ONE OF THE SOMATOSTATINE RECEPTORS

Title (en)

USE OF DIAZEPINS FOR PREPARING MEDICINES FOR TREATING PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS OR DISEASES INVOLVING ONE OF THE SOMATOSTATINE RECEPTORS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON DIAZEPINEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PATHOLOGISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN ODER KRANKHEITEN BEI WELCHEN EINER DER SOMATOSTATINE REZEPTOREN BETEILIGT IST

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DIAZEPINES POUR LA PREPARATION DE MEDICAMENTS DESTINES A TRAITER LES ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES OU LES MALADIES DANS LESQUELS UN DES RECEPTEURS DE LA SOMATOSTATINE EST IMPLIQUE

Publication

EP 1087978 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925093 A

Priority

  • FR 9901422 W
  • FR 9807509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779652A1] The invention concerns the use of pyrido-thieno-triazolo-diazepins for preparing a medicine for treating pathological conditions or diseases involving one of the growth hormone release inhibiting factor receptors. The invention also concerns novel pyrido-thieno-triazolo-diazepins and therapeutic compositions containing them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 495/22; A61K 31/55

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 495/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/5517 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 495/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965917A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779652 A1 19991217; FR 2779652 B1 20010608; AR 019669 A1 20020313; AU 4149599 A 20000105; AU 758206 B2 20030320; CA 2335724 A1 19991223; CN 100348600 C 20071114; CN 1309657 A 20010822; EP 1087978 A1 20010404; HU 0102300 A2 20011128; HU 0102300 A3 20021028; IL 139954 D0 20020210; JP 2002518400 A 20020625; MY 118652 A 20041231; NO 20006352 A 20001213; NO 20006352 D0 20001213; NZ 509313 A 20021126; PL 344831 A1 20011119; RU 2229299 C2 20040527; TW 513434 B 20021211; US 7015213 B1 20060321; WO 9965917 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 495/22 20060101AFI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/55 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF DIAZEPINS FOR PREPARING MEDICINES FOR TREATING PATHOLOGICAL CONDITIONS OR DISEASES INVOLVING ONE OF THE SOMATOSTATINE RECEPTORS

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIGG, DENNIS

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIBERATORE, ANNE-MARIE

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POMMIER, JACQUES

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAYLOR, JOHN

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIGG, DENNIS

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIBERATORE, ANNE-MARIE

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POMMIER, JACQUES

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAYLOR, JOHN

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE