Global Patent Index - EP 1087984 A2

EP 1087984 A2 2001-04-04 - acpS

Title (en)

acpS

Title (de)

acpS

Title (fr)

acpS

Publication

EP 1087984 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99953339 A

Priority

  • US 9911704 W
  • US 8707998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961452A2] The invention provides acpS polypeptides and polynucleotides encoding acpS polypeptides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques. Also provided are methods for utilizing acpS polypeptides to screen for antibacterial compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; C07K 16/12; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/12; C12N 15/31; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/315 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1288 (2013.01); C07K 14/3156 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961452 A2 19991202; WO 9961452 A3 20000615; EP 1087984 A2 20010404; EP 1087984 A4 20050209; JP 2002516078 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070522

2005-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/54 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/31 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 9/12 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/12 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12Q 1/68 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL