Global Patent Index - EP 1088043 A1

EP 1088043 A1 2001-04-04 - INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING REMAINING MATERIAL FROM A THERMAL WASTE DISPOSAL FACILITY

Title (en)

INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING REMAINING MATERIAL FROM A THERMAL WASTE DISPOSAL FACILITY

Title (de)

ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON RESTSTOFF AUS EINER THERMISCHEN ABFALL-ENTSORGUNGSANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE MATIERE RESIDUELLE PROVENANT D'UNE INSTALLATION THERMIQUE D'ELIMINATION DES DECHETS

Publication

EP 1088043 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936246 A

Priority

  • DE 9901449 W
  • DE 19822993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822993A1] According to the invention, the combustible portion (R1) is first separated from the non-combustible portion (R2) in order to separate a carbon-containing fraction (R1, C) from remaining material (R) as completely as possible, for example from pyrolysis remaining material. Afterwards, a carbon-containing light fraction (C) is separated from the small part fraction (F) of the non-combustible portion (R2). For a continuous separation, a combination comprised of a device (2) for separating wire (D) with a heavy part separator (8) arranged downstream therefrom is provided in a preferred embodiment. The carbon-containing fraction (R1, C) obtained thereby is preferably fed to a combustion chamber of a pyrolysis installation for additional valorization.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 53/00; B03B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09B 5/00 (2006.01); B03B 9/04 (2006.01); B07B 1/28 (2006.01); B07B 4/08 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01); B07B 13/00 (2006.01); B07B 13/07 (2006.01); B07B 13/08 (2006.01); C10B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 53/00 (2013.01); B03B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961547A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822993 A1 19991202; DE 19822993 C2 20021114; AT 248210 T 20030915; CA 2333080 A1 19991202; CN 1133715 C 20040107; CN 1302323 A 20010704; DK 1088043 T3 20031222; EP 1088043 A1 20010404; EP 1088043 B1 20030827; ES 2207264 T3 20040516; HU 0101878 A2 20010928; HU 0101878 A3 20020828; JP 2002516379 A 20020604; MY 119662 A 20050630; PL 344308 A1 20011022; PT 1088043 E 20040130; SK 17232000 A3 20010806; TW 500642 B 20020901; US 6484882 B1 20021126; WO 9961547 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070512

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060513

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060512

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-01-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-10-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TAKUMA CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060513

2006-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060513

2006-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2005-08-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207264

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001030

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE