Global Patent Index - EP 1088044 A1

EP 1088044 A1 2001-04-04 - INSTALLATION FOR TREATING REMAINING MATERIAL

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR TREATING REMAINING MATERIAL

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUR RESTSTOFFBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MATIERE RESIDUELLE

Publication

EP 1088044 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936247 A

Priority

  • DE 9901450 W
  • DE 19822991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822991A1] The aim of the invention is to continuously separate inhomogeneous remaining material (IR) generated by a pyrolysis installation such that the remaining material is sorted as completely as possible. To this end, specially selected components are combined with one another in an advantageous arrangement. An essential element of the installation is the separation of coarse remaining material (GR) in a coarse sieve (2) and the subsequent separation of the residual remaining material (R) in a zigzag separator (6) into a light remaining material (LR) and into a heavy remaining material (SR). Using the installation, the portions containing carbon are, in particular, separated from the remaining material (R). The individual components are constructed such that they are, for the most part, self-cleaning in order to enable an operation which is free of interruptions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 53/00; B03B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09B 5/00 (2006.01); B02C 13/14 (2006.01); B03B 9/04 (2006.01); B07B 1/20 (2006.01); B07B 1/22 (2006.01); B07B 4/02 (2006.01); B07B 9/00 (2006.01); C10B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 53/00 (2013.01); B03B 9/04 (2013.01); Y10S 422/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961548A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822991 A1 19991202; DE 19822991 C2 20021114; AT 223470 T 20020915; CA 2333218 A1 19991202; CN 1133714 C 20040107; CN 1302322 A 20010704; DK 1088044 T3 20021230; EP 1088044 A1 20010404; EP 1088044 B1 20020904; ES 2183588 T3 20030316; HU 0101867 A2 20010928; HU 0101867 A3 20021028; JP 2002516181 A 20020604; PL 344307 A1 20011022; PT 1088044 E 20030131; SK 17272000 A3 20010710; US 6953517 B1 20051011; WO 9961548 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070512

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060513

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060512

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2006-10-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TAKUMA CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.

- Free text: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MITSUI ENGINEERING & SHIPBUILDING CO., LTD.#64, TSUKIJI 5-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 104-8439 (JP) $ TAKUMA CO., LTD.#1-3-23 DOJIMAHAMA , KITA -KU#OSAKA 530-004 (JP)

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060513

2006-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060513

2006-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2005-08-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183588 T3

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902579 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223470 T 20020915

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE