Global Patent Index - EP 1088068 A1

EP 1088068 A1 2001-04-04 - IMMUNOMODULATOR POLYPEPTIDE, ZSIG57

Title (en)

IMMUNOMODULATOR POLYPEPTIDE, ZSIG57

Title (de)

IMMUNOMODULATOR POLYPEPTID, ZSIG57

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDE IMMUNOMODULATEUR ZSIG57

Publication

EP 1088068 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925747 A

Priority

  • US 9911337 W
  • US 9960098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966040A1] The present invention relates to polynucleotide and polypeptide molecules for zsig57, a novel member of the immunoglobulin superfamily of proteins. The polynucleotides encoding zsig57, are located on chromosome 6, and may, for example, be used to identify a region of the genome associated with human disease states. The present invention also includes methods for producing the protein, uses therefor and antibodies thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C12N 15/62; C12N 5/10; C12N 1/19; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12R 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70503 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/022 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966040 A1 19991223; AU 4197499 A 20000105; CA 2331253 A1 19991223; EP 1088068 A1 20010404; IL 140120 D0 20020210; JP 2002518009 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 15/62 20060101AFI20061121BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 5/10 20060101ALI20061121BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/705 20060101ALI20061121BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 16/28 20060101ALI20061121BHEP

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 A

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/62 B

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 5/10 B

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 1/19 B

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/705 B

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/28 B

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12R 1/84 K

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12R 1:84 K

2005-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 1:19 Z

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031204

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHEPPARD, PAUL, O.

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE