Global patent index - EP 1088070 A2

EP 1088070 A2 2001-04-04 - INTERFERENCE WITH VIRAL IRES-MEDIATED TRANSLATION BY A SMALL YEAST RNA REVEALS CRITICAL RNA-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (en)

INTERFERENCE WITH VIRAL IRES-MEDIATED TRANSLATION BY A SMALL YEAST RNA REVEALS CRITICAL RNA-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS

Title (de)

SELEKTIVE HEMMUNG VON INTERN INITIERTER RNA TRANSLATIONS

Title (fr)

MISE EN EVIDENCE DES INTERACTIONS CRITIQUES ENTRE PROTEINES D'ARN PAR INTERFERENCE AVEC LA TRADUCTION VIRALE A MEDIATION D'IRES PAR L'ARN D'UNE PETITE LEVURE

Publication

EP 1088070 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99928330 A

Priority

  • US 9911281 W
  • US 8652798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961613A2] Peptides and RNA oligonucleotides and methods of use for the inhibition of translation of an mRNA, which is initiated at an internal ribosome entry site of the mRNA and requires binding of a protein factor to that site, are disclosed. Peptides comprising the La autoantigen binding domain (LAP) are disclosed. LAP peptides alone or in combination with inhibitor RNA oligonucleotides (IRNA) may be used as antiviral agents to inhibit internal ribosome entry site (IRES) mediated viral replication.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 31/16 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/11 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/67 (2013.01); C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); C12N 15/11 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961613A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961613 A2 19991202; WO 9961613 A3 20000217; AU 4542499 A 19991213; AU 770432 B2 20040219; CA 2329155 A1 19991202; EP 1088070 A2 20010404; JP 2002516100 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1036301

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DAS, SAUMITRA

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DASGUPTA, ASIM

2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050913

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DAS, SAUMITRA

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DASGUPTA, ASIM

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE