Global Patent Index - EP 1088110 A1

EP 1088110 A1 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR FLESHING, STRETCHING AND DRYING LEATHER OR SIMILAR FLAT MATERIALS SUCH AS SKINS, FURS AND SUCH LIKE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FLESHING, STRETCHING AND DRYING LEATHER OR SIMILAR FLAT MATERIALS SUCH AS SKINS, FURS AND SUCH LIKE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLICKEN, STRECKEN UND TROCKNEN VON LEDER ODER ÄHNLICHEN FLACHMATERIALIEN WIE FELLEN, PELZEN UND DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ECHARNER, ETIRER ET SECHER DU CUIR OU D'AUTRES MATERIAUX PLATS ANALOGUES, TELS QUE DES PEAUX, FOURRURES ET SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 1088110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936404 A

Priority

  • DE 9901636 W
  • DE 19826181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826181A1] The invention relates to a device for fleshing, stretching and drying leather or similar flat materials such as skins, furs or such like. The main disadvantage of the prior art lies in the construction-related friction forces which prevent the optimal pulling of the leather being stretched and even extension of same and therefore limits the dimensional gains which can be achieved. In contrast, the invention provided for by the invention is formed by elements which minimize the friction forces encountered when stretching leather in a vacuum. These elements consist of movable lamellae (LM) which can be extended from the centre outwards and which under vacuum and with the cooperation of a pressing device formed by either a stretchable membrane or a second lamella system, provide a smooth, gliding, heatable contact surface on which the stretched and fixed piece of leather (L) is simultaneously dried. The moisture is evacuated through channels, raised areas, perforations and such like in one of the elements. In this way the piece of leather is uniformly stretched across its entire surface without wrinkling and the stretching effect improved considerably.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/26; C14B 1/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/26 (2006.01); C14B 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/58 (2013.01); C14B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826181 A1 19991216; EP 1088110 A1 20010404; EP 1088110 B1 20020731; ES 2181459 T3 20030216; US 6615621 B1 20030909; WO 9966081 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070602

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060601

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181459 T3

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902204 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT