Global Patent Index - EP 1088112 A1

EP 1088112 A1 2001-04-04 - WATER-COOLED VESSEL FOR VACUUM PROCESSING OF LIQUID STEEL

Title (en)

WATER-COOLED VESSEL FOR VACUUM PROCESSING OF LIQUID STEEL

Title (de)

MIT EINER WASSERKÜHLUNG VERSEHENES GEFÄSS FÜR DIE VAKUUMBEHANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM STAHL

Title (fr)

CUVE A REFROIDISSEMENT A EAU POUR LE TRAITEMENT SOUS VIDE D'ACIER LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1088112 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934506 A

Priority

  • DE 9901472 W
  • DE 19822159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822159A1] The metal casing (19) of the top section (15) including the waste gas connection (16) is provided with water cooling, and is subjected with its inner side directly to the process conditions present in the vessel (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960174A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822159 A1 19991118; AT 231924 T 20030215; BR 9910506 A 20010130; CN 1243837 C 20060301; CN 1308687 A 20010815; EP 1088112 A1 20010404; EP 1088112 B1 20030129; ES 2192061 T3 20030916; KR 100439642 B1 20040712; RU 2201459 C2 20030327; US 6638471 B1 20031028; WO 9960174 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59904170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-10-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130517

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130517

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130518

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130517

2014-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-12-19 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59904170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131028

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131201

2013-10-28 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59904170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2009-08-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-08-28 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2009-08-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2192061

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAI FUCHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020409

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE