Global Patent Index - EP 1088142 A2

EP 1088142 A2 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING AN EXTERIOR HANDLE TO A CLOSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONNECTING AN EXTERIOR HANDLE TO A CLOSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES AUSSENGRIFFS MIT EINEM SCHLIESSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR RELIER UNE POIGNEE EXTERIEURE A UN SYSTEME DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1088142 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99938157 A

Priority

  • DE 9901696 W
  • DE 19826778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826778A1] The invention relates to a device for connecting an exterior handle (31) to a closing system (5), especially for vehicle doors and vehicle hinged lids. Said exterior handle is arranged on the exterior skin (8) of a motor vehicle and is subjected to the action of a spring force. The aim of the invention is to create a device which can be manufactured in a simple and economical manner and which can be installed with little complexity. To this end, the exterior handle (31) comprises a holding fixture (31') which can be brought into contact in an interactive manner with a connecting element (40) which can be inserted from the exterior. In addition, the one end of the connecting element (40) which is assigned to the closing system (5) can be interactively connected to an actuating element (37) which unlatches the one blocking element of the closing system (5). The other end of the connecting element (40) is displaceably mounted on an insertion part (32) which can be inserted from the exterior skin (8) and which can be fixed with regard to the exterior skin (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2014.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 85/16 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01); E05B 85/16 (2013.01); Y10S 292/31 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5761 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7655 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8541 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964702A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826778 A1 19991223; BR 9911136 A 20010508; EP 1088142 A2 20010404; EP 1088142 B1 20020220; ES 2172998 T3 20021001; US 6748775 B1 20040615; WO 9964702 A2 19991216; WO 9964702 A3 20000203; WO 9964702 A8 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090604

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-06-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040605

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172998

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020520

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-28

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE