Global patent index - EP 1088144 A1

EP 1088144 A1 2001-04-04 - CLOSURE, ESPECIALLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

CLOSURE, ESPECIALLY FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

FERMETURE DESTINEE NOTAMMENT A DES VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1088144 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927825 A

Priority

  • DE 19828289 A
  • EP 9903789 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828289A1] The invention relates to a closure comprising a closing head (20) and a lock (10) which rest on the immobile or mobile part of a door, flap or such like. The closing head (20) has an undercut axial shoulder (26) which during coupling is engaged by a radially mobile blocking member (11) in the lock (10). The lock (10) further comprises a sensing member (12) and a restoring member (13) for the blocking member (11). To make the lock less prone to malfunctions the invention provides for the axially spring-loaded sensing member (12) to be used as a locking means for the radially spring-loaded blocking member (11). When the locking effect is actuated the blocking member (11) is held in a release position in relation to the closing head (20). When the closing head (20) is engaged the sensing member (12) carries out an axial movement which releases the lock so that the radial spring-loading can move the blocking member (11) into its blocked position. Actuation of the restoring member (13) results in a radial reverse movement of the blocking member (11), which activates the locking of the sensing member (12) and locks the blocking member (11) in its release position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/18 (2006.01); E05B 81/18 (2014.01); E05B 83/16 (2014.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/18 (2013.01); E05B 45/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1083 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1091 (2015.04); Y10T 292/444 (2015.04); Y10T 292/696 (2015.04); Y10T 292/699 (2015.04); Y10T 292/702 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967490A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828289 A1 20000113; AU 4504099 A 20000110; AU 746319 B2 20020418; BR 9912197 A 20010410; CN 1306598 A 20010801; EP 1088144 A1 20010404; EP 1088144 B1 20020327; ES 2171330 T3 20020901; JP 2002519544 A 20020702; PT 1088144 E 20020930; US 6595561 B1 20030722; WO 9967490 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2016-02-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160205

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59901074

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120426

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20041202

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-06-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-03-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2171330

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901074

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE