Global patent index - EP 1088151 A1

EP 1088151 A1 2001-04-04 - DOWNHOLE MILLING DEVICE

Title (en)

DOWNHOLE MILLING DEVICE

Title (de)

FRÄSVORRICHTUNG IM BOHRLOCH

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FRAISAGE EN FOND DE TROU

Publication

EP 1088151 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936456 A

Priority

  • EP 99936456 A
  • EP 9904039 W
  • EP 98304595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964715A1] A device for performing milling operations in an underground borehole comprises a toppling head (2) which is pivotably secured to a stator housing (1) and which is equipped with one or more rotatable mills (3, 4) which are in use pivoted together with the toppling head (2) into an extended position from the stator housing (1) to mill a window in a surrounding casing (23), or to underream the wellbore whilst the stator housing is rotated in the wellbore.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 29/06; E21B 4/16; E21B 7/28; E21B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/16 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01); E21B 27/00 (2006.01); E21B 27/02 (2006.01); E21B 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 27/02 (2013.01); E21B 29/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964715A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964715 A1 19991216; AU 5155099 A 19991230; AU 741468 B2 20011129; BR 9911083 A 20010220; CA 2334150 A1 19991216; CN 1119499 C 20030827; CN 1305562 A 20010725; DE 69905364 D1 20030320; EA 002048 B1 20011224; EP 1088151 A1 20010404; EP 1088151 B1 20030212; ID 27015 A 20010222; NO 20006247 A 20001208; NO 20006247 D0 20001208; NO 314855 B1 20030602; NZ 508288 A 20030328; OA 11626 A 20040909

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040609

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030528

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905364

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-02-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT NL