Global Patent Index - EP 1088152 A1

EP 1088152 A1 2001-04-04 - METHOD OF DETERMINING AZIMUTH OF A BOREHOLE

Title (en)

METHOD OF DETERMINING AZIMUTH OF A BOREHOLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BOHRLOCHAZIMUTBESTIMMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE L'AZIMUT D'UN TROU DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 1088152 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927912 A

Priority

  • EP 99927912 A
  • EP 9903940 W
  • EP 98304821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966173A1] A method is provided of determining an azimuth angle of a borehole formed in an earth formation using a magnetometer tool arranged in a drill string extending in the borehole, the magnetometer tool having a selected orientation relative to the drill string. The method comprises a) selecting at least two locations along the borehole at which the borehole has selected different borehole inclinations, b) for each selected location, arranging the drill string in the borehole such that the magnetometer tool is positioned at the selected location and operating the magnetometer tool so as to measure a local magnetic field including the earth magnetic field and a drill string magnetisation field having a component in a substantially vertical plane through the longitudinal axis of the drill string at the selected location, c) determining from the measured magnetic field and from the selected borehole inclinations, said component of the drill string magnetisation field, d) correcting the measured magnetic field for said component of the drill string magnetisation field, and e) determining from the corrected magnetic field, the borehole azimuth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966173 A1 19991223; AU 4509399 A 20000105; AU 748917 B2 20020613; BR 9911307 A 20010313; CA 2334920 A1 19991223; CA 2334920 C 20080429; CN 1305565 A 20010725; DE 69923179 D1 20050217; DE 69923179 T2 20060105; EP 1088152 A1 20010404; EP 1088152 B1 20050112; ES 2237113 T3 20050716; NO 20006450 A 20010216; NO 20006450 D0 20001218; NO 320686 B1 20060116

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080609

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237113 T3

2005-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923179 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020820

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL