Global Patent Index - EP 1088153 A1

EP 1088153 A1 2001-04-04 - DISPLACEMENT MACHINE BASED ON THE SPIRAL PRINCIPLE

Title (en)

DISPLACEMENT MACHINE BASED ON THE SPIRAL PRINCIPLE

Title (de)

VERDRÄNGERMASCHINE NACH DEM SPIRALPRINZIP

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE REFOULEMENT CONSTRUITE SELON LE PRINCIPE DE LA SPIRALE

Publication

EP 1088153 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00901476 A

Priority

  • CH 0000077 W
  • CH 31399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049275A1] A displacement machine for compressible media has two spiral feed chambers (11a, 11b) that are arranged opposite each other in a fixed housing (7a, 7b). Spiral displacement bodies (2-4) engage with these feed chambers. Said displacement bodies essentially consist of a disc (2) and spiral strips (3a, 3b) that are attached to each side of the disc. The strips are configured in an eccentric manner in relation to the housing, so that during operation each point on the displacement body carries out a circular or elliptical movement, depending on the type of guiding device (49). This movement is restricted by the cylinder walls of the feed chamber. One feed chamber (11a) is configured for compressing the working substance and the other feed chamber (11b) for expanding said substance. The feed chambers and the strips (3a, 3b) that engage with said chambers consist of successive circular arc segments. The radii of the circular arc segments in the feed chambers on the compression side (11a) decrease in size when viewed from the direction of rotation. The radii of the circular arc segments in the feed chambers on the expansion side (11b) increase in size, when viewed from the same direction of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01C 1/02; F01C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/02 (2006.01); F01C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 1/0223 (2013.01); F01C 11/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049275A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049275 A1 20000824; DE 50009088 D1 20050203; EP 1088153 A1 20010404; EP 1088153 B1 20041229; US 6579080 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009088

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-07-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-03-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009088 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031209

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRT COMMON RAIL TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPINNLER, FRITZ

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE