Global Patent Index - EP 1088159 A1

EP 1088159 A1 2001-04-04 - STARTING SYSTEM FOR A COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID STARTING SYSTEM

Title (en)

STARTING SYSTEM FOR A COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID STARTING SYSTEM

Title (de)

STARTANLAGE FÜR EINE VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DER STARTANLAGE

Title (fr)

DEMARREUR POUR MOTEUR THERMIQUE ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1088159 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929245 A

Priority

  • DE 0000916 W
  • DE 19914903 A
  • DE 10005005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060235A1] The invention relates to a starting system for a combustion engine and a method for operating said starting system. The starting system consists of a starter pinion which can be engaged with a motor shaft of the combustion engine via a ring gear of the motor, an electronically switchable electromotor which transmits torque to the starter pinion during starting of the combustion engine and an electronically switchable actuator whose operation can at least engage the pinion in the ring gear of the motor (pinion-engaging phase) or can decouple said components (free-wheel phase). The starting system also consists of a sensory mechanism by means of which progression of the start-up is detected and a control unit which controls the electromotor and the actuator during starting on the basis of the signals provided by the sensory mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/02 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01); F02N 11/10 (2006.01); F02N 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 11/0851 (2013.01); F02N 11/106 (2013.01); F02N 2011/0874 (2013.01); F02N 2200/041 (2013.01); F02N 2200/045 (2013.01); F02N 2200/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060235A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060235 A1 20001012; BR 0006014 A 20010306; EP 1088159 A1 20010404; JP 2002541376 A 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031017

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE