Global Patent Index - EP 1088166 A1

EP 1088166 A1 2001-04-04 - DIAPHRAGM PUMP AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SAME

Title (en)

DIAPHRAGM PUMP AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING SAME

Title (de)

MEMBRANPUMPE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

POMPE A MEMBRANE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER CETTE DERNIERE

Publication

EP 1088166 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926372 A

Priority

  • DE 19826610 A
  • EP 9903541 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826610A1] The invention relates to a diaphragm pump comprising a device for controlling the position of a membrane (4) separating the supply chamber and displacement chamber. To replace the mechanical control of the refilling process a pressure sensor (6) is positioned in the displacement chamber and connected to an evaluation unit (8) which is configured to generate a refill signal that is switched such as to actuate a refill valve (9) by means of an active interconnection (17). A further sensor for detecting the piston path (7) is advantageously provided for whose signal is combined with the signal of the pressure sensor. The invention also relates to a method for controlling the position of a membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/067; F04B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 43/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/067 (2013.01); F04B 43/0081 (2013.01); F04B 2203/0903 (2013.01); F04B 2205/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966204A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826610 A1 19991223; AT 221620 T 20020815; EP 1088166 A1 20010404; EP 1088166 B1 20020731; ES 2183566 T3 20030316; JP 2002518635 A 20020625; JP 4153166 B2 20080917; US 6554578 B1 20030429; WO 9966204 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902205

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2013-11-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902205

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH

- Free text: BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 4#D-22844 NORDERSTEDT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH#WERKSTRASSE 4#D-22844 NORDERSTEDT (DE)

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAN + LUEBBE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183566 T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902205 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221620 T 20020815

2002-05-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIAPHRAGM PUMP AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIAPHRAGM PUMP AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SAME

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE