Global Patent Index - EP 1088179 A2

EP 1088179 A2 2001-04-04 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE HYDROSTATIC-MECHANICAL POWER SPLIT TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE HYDROSTATIC-MECHANICAL POWER SPLIT TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

STUFENLOSES HYDROSTATISCH-MECHANISCHES LEISTUNGSVERZWEIGUNGSGETRIEBE

Title (fr)

BOITE DE TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE HYDROSTATIQUE-MECANIQUE A VARIATION CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1088179 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00910496 A

Priority

  • DE 0000210 W
  • DE 19902793 A
  • DE 19904073 A
  • DE 19916526 A
  • DE 19917935 A
  • DE 19944793 A
  • DE 19957912 A
  • DE 19959240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0043695A2] The invention relates to a hydrostatic-mechanical power split transmission, especially for use in tractors. In order to economically utilize the provided installation space in tractors, the invention provides that the hydrostatic transmission (4) and the planetary drum selector gear (PSW) are arranged together along the same axis and are integrated as a common modular unit in the carrier housing or in the vehicle frame. The transmission also contains the feed pump (279) and the control/regulating device which comprises the electronics. A traversing shaft (PTO) connected to the input shaft (1) is provided for the power take-off connection. The vehicle drive is effected via the drive shaft (336) which can be connected directly or via a corresponding spur gear stage to the pinion input shaft of the axle differential gearing in a manner which is axially offset to the output. The planetary drum selector gear (PSW) is, particularly according to the performance class of the vehicle, configured as a single-range transmission without clutches or as a range-change transmission with two or more clutches. When the transmission is configured as a single-range transmission, a range-shifting transmission which is arranged downstream can be alternatively provided. By virtue of the inline construction, the long installation space which inherently exists in the tractor can be used, and the provision of a very economical and simple structure is made possible. In addition, it is feasible to provide a very important narrow construction for tractors, said construction being determined by the maximum measure X . The transmission can be installed or removed in a few minutes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 37/08 (2006.01); F16H 47/04 (2006.01); F16H 61/46 (2010.01); F16H 61/462 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 47/04 (2013.01); F16H 37/084 (2013.01); F16H 61/46 (2013.01); F16H 61/462 (2013.01); F16H 59/46 (2013.01); F16H 2037/0886 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0043695A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0043695 A2 20000727; WO 0043695 A3 20010201; DE 10003174 A1 20000921; EP 1088179 A2 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEYERLE, HANNELORE

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEYERLE, MARTIN PETER

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEYERLE, JUERGEN

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYERLE, HANNELORE

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYERLE, MARTIN PETER

2004-03-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYERLE, JUERGEN

2004-03-24 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20031009

2004-03-24 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-09-17 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030915

2002-01-09 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE