Global patent index - EP 1088191 A1

EP 1088191 A1 2001-04-04 - FILL AND BLEED MODULE FOR A REFRIGERATING MODULE AND A METHOD FOR FILLING A REFRIGERATING MODULE

Title (en)

FILL AND BLEED MODULE FOR A REFRIGERATING MODULE AND A METHOD FOR FILLING A REFRIGERATING MODULE

Title (de)

BEFÜLL- UND ENTNAHMEMODUL FÜR EIN KÜHLMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES KÜHLMODULS

Title (fr)

MODULE DE REMPLISSAGE ET DE PRELEVEMENT POUR MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET PROCEDE POUR REMPLIR UN MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT

Publication

EP 1088191 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908928 A

Priority

  • DE 19808267 A
  • EP 9901072 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808267A1] The invention relates to a fill and bleed module (3) for carbon dioxide in a refrigerating module (1) assigned to a refrigerating container (2). Means (5, 9) which are assigned to said fill and bleed module are provided for supplying the solid carbon dioxide into the refrigerating module (1). For this, said means have an end which can be connected to an inlet (4) of the refrigerating module (1). Other means (7, 8) are provided for carrying the essentially gaseous carbon dioxide out of the refrigerating module (1). These means have an end which can be connected to an outlet (6) of the refrigerating module (1). The means (5, 7, 8, 9) for supplying and carrying away the carbon dioxide are assigned to a common housing (33) and are configured in such a way that essentially gaseous carbon dioxide is carried out of the refrigerating module (1), and, to a large extent, does not escape into the medium surrounding the refrigerating container (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943996A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808267 A1 19990902; AR 014658 A1 20010328; AT 323269 T 20060415; BR 9908327 A 20001107; CZ 20003085 A3 20011114; CZ 302221 B6 20101229; DE 59913332 D1 20060524; DK 1088191 T3 20060626; EG 22247 A 20021130; EP 1088191 A1 20010404; EP 1088191 B1 20060412; ES 2263271 T3 20061201; HU 0102044 A2 20011028; HU 0102044 A3 20011228; HU 224600 B1 20051128; PL 191228 B1 20060331; PL 342618 A1 20010618; PT 1088191 E 20060731; SK 12972000 A3 20010409; SK 286032 B6 20080107; WO 9943996 A1 19990902; ZA 9901545 B 19990825

INPADOC legal status

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-16 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060412

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060412

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-20 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-06-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20101209

2011-06-15 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20101209

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2008-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

2007-12-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

2007-10-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-10-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

2007-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: YARA INTERNATIONAL ASA

- Effective date: 20070112

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2263271

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-11-15 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-09-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20060402408

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20060525

2006-07-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-05-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041103

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE