Global patent index - EP 1088193 A1

EP 1088193 A1 2001-04-04 - A DRIER FOR GRAIN AND GRANULAR MATERIALS IN GENERAL

Title (en)

A DRIER FOR GRAIN AND GRANULAR MATERIALS IN GENERAL

Title (de)

TROCKNER FÜR GETREIDE UND KÖRNIGES GUT IM ALLGEMEINEN

Title (fr)

SECHOIR A GRAIN ET A MATIERES GRANULAIRES EN GENERAL

Publication

EP 1088193 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99929143 A

Priority

  • EP 9903887 W
  • IT PD980154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966276A1] A drier for grains and similar material comprises a drying chamber (10) and a first vertical screw conveyor (15) associated with the drying chamber for picking up material from the lower portion (10b) of the chamber (10) and carrying it to the upper portion of the chamber. The vertical screw conveyor (15) is arranged outside the drying chamber (10) and is coupled at its lower end to a second horizontal screw conveyor (14) operative between an output opening (11) provided in the lower portion (10b) of the chamber (10) and the vertical conveyor (15). A mixer device with radial blades (21) is mounted in the lower portion of the drying chamber, immediately above the output opening (11) to provide both for mixing of the material and for directing it forcedly through the output opening (11) into the second horizontal conveyor (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 9/06; F26B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 9/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966276A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966276 A1 19991223; AT 267992 T 20040615; AU 4605899 A 20000105; DE 69917637 D1 20040701; EP 1088193 A1 20010404; EP 1088193 B1 20040526; ES 2221392 T3 20041216; IT PD980154 A1 19991220; PL 192884 B1 20061229; PL 344995 A1 20011119

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2006-06-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221392

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917637

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: RO SI

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020718

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20001205;SI PAYMENT 20001205