Global Patent Index - EP 1088229 A1

EP 1088229 A1 2001-04-04 - HIGH THROUGHPUT METHODS, SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING CELL BASED SCREENING ASSAYS

Title (en)

HIGH THROUGHPUT METHODS, SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING CELL BASED SCREENING ASSAYS

Title (de)

HOCHDURCHSATZ VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNG UM ZELL-BASIERENDE SCREENINGASSAYS DURCHZUFÜHREN

Title (fr)

METHODES, SYSTEMES ET APPAREIL A DEBIT ELEVE POUR TEST DE CRIBLAGE DE CELLULES

Publication

EP 1088229 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933529 A

Priority

  • US 9913918 W
  • US 10451998 A
  • US 11737099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967639A1] Methods for determining a function of cells, which comprises a suspension of cells flowing along a first fluid channel. The cells have a first detectable property associated therewith, and wherein the cells produce a second detectable property upon activation of the function of the cells, the first and second detectable properties being distinguishable from each other. The levels of the first and second detectable properties are measured. The level of second detectable property is compared to the level of first detectable property to determine the relative function of the cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53; B44C 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/50273 (2013.01); G01N 33/5005 (2013.01); G01N 33/56972 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0816 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0415 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0487 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967639 A1 19991229; EP 1088229 A1 20010404; EP 1088229 A4 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040423

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031212

2002-05-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 01L 3/00 A, 7B 01J 19/00 B, 7G 01N 33/487 B, 7G 01N 21/07 B, 7C 12Q 1/00 B

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALIPER TECHNOLOGIES, CORP.

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE