Global Patent Index - EP 1088258 A1

EP 1088258 A1 2001-04-04 - FIXING STATION FOR FIXING TONER IMAGES ON A SUPPORTING MATERIAL WITH A MOBILE COVERING DEVICE

Title (en)

FIXING STATION FOR FIXING TONER IMAGES ON A SUPPORTING MATERIAL WITH A MOBILE COVERING DEVICE

Title (de)

FIXIERSTATION ZUM FIXIEREN VON TONERBILDERN AUF EINEM TRÄGERMATERIAL MIT EINER BEWEGBAREN ABDECKVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

POSTE DE FIXATION POUR FIXER DES IMAGES POUDREUSES SUR UN MATERIAU SUPPORT AVEC UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE DE RECOUVREMENT

Publication

EP 1088258 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929252 A

Priority

  • DE 19827210 A
  • EP 9904191 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827210C1] The invention relates to a fixing station for fixing toner images on a supporting material (10). A covering device (16) is arranged between the supporting material (10) and a heat radiation source (12). Said covering device can move in the beam path between the heat radiation source (12) and the supporting material (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/2007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966372A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827210 C1 19991216; EP 1088258 A1 20010404; EP 1088258 B1 20031119; US 6449458 B1 20020910; WO 9966372 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907807

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907807

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH, 85586 POING, DE

- Document: DE 59907807

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-10-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907807

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907807

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAUMBURG, THOENES, THURN, LAN, DE

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907807 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIXING STATION FOR FIXING TONER IMAGES ON A SUPPORTING MATERIAL WITH A MOBILE COVERING DEVICE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB