Global patent index - EP 1088294 A1

EP 1088294 A1 2001-04-04 - AUTOMATION SYSTEM WITH RADIO SENSOR

Title (en)

AUTOMATION SYSTEM WITH RADIO SENSOR

Title (de)

AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT FUNKSENSOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AUTOMATISATION AVEC DETECTEUR RADIO

Publication

EP 1088294 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936401 A

Priority

  • DE 9901633 W
  • DE 19826513 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826513A1] The invention relates to an automation system (1, 2) comprising a control device (1) for controlling a processing device (2), especially a production device. The system also comprises at least one sensor (4, 5) for transmitting sensor data (11) from the processing device (2) to the control device (1). To reduce the cost of installing sensors the invention provides for the sensor (4, 5) to comprise a radio-transmission device (8) and radio-reception device (9) for the wireless transmission of the sensor data (11) to the receiving device (9) connected to the control device (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/02; G07C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/00 (2006.01); G07C 3/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G07C 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966473A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826513 A1 19991223; EP 1088294 A1 20010404; EP 1088294 B1 20030820; JP 2002518762 A 20020625; US 2001003163 A1 20010607; WO 9966473 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060506

2006-10-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060506

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906690

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB