Global patent index - EP 1088316 A1

EP 1088316 A1 2001-04-04 - THIN ELECTRET LAYER AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD

Title (en)

THIN ELECTRET LAYER AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD

Title (de)

DÜNNE ELEKTRETSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MINCE COUCHE D'ELECTRET ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1088316 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920448 A

Priority

  • AT 9900119 W
  • AT 80098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959172A1] Thin electret layer with a layer thickness of less than 200 mu m made of polymers containing fluorine. The mean chain length of the polymer chain contained in the layer produced by evaporation, sputtering, ablation, blowing or dispersion using a solid starting material made of polymers containing fluorine is at least half the length of the chains in the starting material and the cross-linking degree of the polymer chains contained in the layer is at the most twice that of the cross-linking degree in the starting material. In order to produce said electret layer, a layer made of polymers containing fluorine is applied on a substrate by means of pulsed laser deposition. The wave length of the laser beams used is between 100 nm and 20 mu m and pulse duration is between 10 fs and 1 ms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01G 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 14/12 (2006.01); C23C 14/28 (2006.01); H01G 7/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/822 (2006.01); H01L 27/04 (2006.01); H04R 19/01 (2006.01); H04R 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01G 7/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959172A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959172 A1 19991118; AT A80098 A 19990615; AU 3802599 A 19991129; EP 1088316 A1 20010404; JP 2002515643 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEITZ, JOHANNES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAEUERLE, DIETER, PROF. DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAEUERLE, DIETER, PROF. DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEITZ, JOHANNES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAEUERLE, DIETER, PROF. DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEITZ, JOHANNES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB