Global patent index - EP 1088318 A2

EP 1088318 A2 2001-04-04 - DEVICE FOR SAFELY DISCONNECTING AN ELECTRICAL LOAD WITH ESPECIALLY HIGH INDUCTIVITY FROM AN ELECTRICAL DC-VOLTAGE SUPPLY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SAFELY DISCONNECTING AN ELECTRICAL LOAD WITH ESPECIALLY HIGH INDUCTIVITY FROM AN ELECTRICAL DC-VOLTAGE SUPPLY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHEREN ABSCHALTUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN LAST, MIT INSBESONDERE HOHER INDUKTIVITÄT, VON EINER ELEKTRISCHEN GLEICHSPANNUNGSVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DECONNEXION FIABLE D'UNE CHARGE ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT A FORTE INDUCTIVITE, D'UN SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN TENSION CONTINUE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1088318 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99936261 A

Priority

  • DE 9901480 W
  • DE 29809550 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2333483A1] A first and a second line (L1, L2) conduct the input direct voltage (Ue) to the load. A fuse (S) is connected in series in the first line. The switching contact (K11) of a first relay (K1) is also connected in series in the first line and is opened during a disconnecting operation. The switching contact (K21) of a second relay (K2) is connected in parallel between the first and second line after the first relay and is closed during a disconnecting operation, after the first relay has been opened. The inventive device is ve ry fault-tolerant, even with usual commercial relays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02H 7/085 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963561A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809550 U1 19990708; CA 2333483 A1 19991209; CN 1113447 C 20030702; CN 1287702 A 20010314; EP 1088318 A2 20010404; EP 1088318 B1 20020403; JP 2002517968 A 20020618; JP 3831611 B2 20061011; US 2001002101 A1 20010531; US 6366434 B2 20020402; WO 9963561 A2 19991209; WO 9963561 A3 20000602

INPADOC legal status

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901130

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130517

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100517

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080518

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080531

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901130

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000619

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE