Global Patent Index - EP 1088349 A1

EP 1088349 A1 2001-04-04 - ROOFING ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SOLAR CELL

Title (en)

ROOFING ELEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE SOLAR CELL

Title (de)

ABDECKELEMENT MIT MINDESTENS EINER SOLARZELLE

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE TOITURE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE

Publication

EP 1088349 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928232 A

Priority

  • NL 9900375 W
  • NL 1009418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966563A1] The invention relates to a roofing element (1) comprising at least one electric solar cell. The roofing element has the shape of a plurality of roofing tiles (2) overlappingly arranged relative to each other in rows and/or columns. The at least one solar cell (4) can have the shape of a plurality of roofing tiles overlappingly arranged relative to each other in rows/or columns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 31/048

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/40 (2006.01); E04D 13/18 (2006.01); F24J 2/04 (2006.01); H01L 31/042 (2006.01); H01L 31/048 (2006.01); H01L 31/058 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24J 2/0455 (2013.01); H02S 20/23 (2014.12); H02S 20/25 (2014.12); H02S 40/44 (2014.12); Y02B 10/12 (2013.01); Y02B 10/20 (2013.01); Y02B 10/70 (2013.01); Y02E 10/44 (2013.01); Y02E 10/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966563 A1 19991223; AU 4533499 A 20000105; CA 2335159 A1 19991223; EP 1088349 A1 20010404; JP 2002518852 A 20020625; NL 1009418 C2 19991220

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLANTFEBER, WILCO JOHAN THOMAS

2011-07-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLANTFEBER, WILCO JOHAN THOMAS

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-08-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060126

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE