Global Patent Index - EP 1088374 A1

EP 1088374 A1 2001-04-04 - LEADTHROUGH ADAPTER FOR SWITCHGEAR CABINETS

Title (en)

LEADTHROUGH ADAPTER FOR SWITCHGEAR CABINETS

Title (de)

DURCHFÜHRUNGSADAPTER FÜR SCHALTSCHRÄNKE

Title (fr)

ADAPTATEUR DE TRAVERSEE POUR ARMOIRE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1088374 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927951 A

Priority

  • DE 19826453 A
  • EP 9904018 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19826453A1] The invention relates to a leadthrough adapter for connecting the components installed in a switchgear cabinet to external electric conductors (12). The adapter is located in a wall of the switchgear cabinet housing and one or more bushings (22)are situated on the face of the adapter. Said bushings (22) can be accessed from the outside of the switchgear cabinet and plug-in connectors (13) can be inserted into the bushings (22) in order to connect the external electric conductors (12). Electric and/or electronic functional parts for the components that are accommodated inside the switchgear cabinet are arranged directly on the back of the adapter which faces towards the inside of the switchgear cabinet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/06; H01R 13/518; H01R 13/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2006.01); H01R 24/14 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01); H01R 13/74 (2006.01); H01R 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 13/74 (2013.01); H01R 31/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966606A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826453 A1 19991216; DE 19826453 C2 20000824; CA 2335067 A1 19991213; CA 2335067 C 20060808; EP 1088374 A1 20010404; EP 1088374 B1 20011121; US 6454368 B1 20020924; WO 9966606 A1 19991223; WO 9966606 A8 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900694

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900694

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900694

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900694 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEDAU, NORBERT

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAGER, GERMAN

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUIR, ALEXANDER

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLICHTIG, KARL

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEDAU, NORBERT

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAGER, GERMAN

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUIR, ALEXANDER

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHLICHTIG, KARL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED