Global Patent Index - EP 1088421 A2

EP 1088421 A2 2001-04-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING INFORMATION OVER LOW BANDWIDTH COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING INFORMATION OVER LOW BANDWIDTH COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNG ÜBER KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZE MIT GERINGER BANDBREITE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE COMMUNIQUER DES INFORMATIONS SUR DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION A FAIBLE LARGEUR DE BANDE

Publication

EP 1088421 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99925903 A

Priority

  • US 9911682 W
  • US 8751598 A
  • US 8755298 A
  • US 8756398 A
  • US 8688898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962268A2] A system having a distributed web site is described. The web site is distributed between a client (100), a server (180), and a web server (140). The client stores a set of predefined applications (106) that correspond to a part of the web site. The applications are formatted according to a first markup language. From the set of predefined applications, the client can generate queries (122). The server receives the queries and generates new, related queries (126). The new queries correspond to a second query protocol. The second query protocol is used by the web server. The web server generates responses (136) to the new queries and sends these responses to the server. The responses are formatted according to a second markup language. These responses correspond to the second portion of the web site. The server then converts the responses into new responses (132) that the client can use.

[origin: WO9962268A2] A system having a distributed web site is described. The web site is distributed between a client, a server and a web server. The client stores a set of predefined applications that correspond to a part of the web site. The applications are formatted according to a first markup language. From the set of predefined applications, the client can generate queries. The server receives the queries and generates new, related queries. The new queries correspond to a second query protocol. The second query protocol is used by the web server. The web server generates responses to the new queries and sends these responses to the server. The responses are formatted according to a second markup language. These responses correspond to the second portion of the web site. The server then converts the responses into new responses that the client can use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 28/06 (2009.01); H04W 4/00 (2009.01); H04W 4/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30905 (2013.01); H04L 67/04 (2013.01); H04L 67/2823 (2013.01); H04L 67/2828 (2013.01); H04W 28/06 (2013.01); H04W 4/00 (2013.01); H04W 4/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962268 A2 19991202; WO 9962268 A3 20000706; AT 463006 T 20100415; AU 4210099 A 19991213; AU 4407899 A 19991213; CA 2333033 A1 19991202; CA 2333033 C 20110802; CA 2333055 A1 19991202; DE 69942202 D1 20100512; EP 1088421 A2 20010404; EP 1088421 A4 20060405; EP 1092186 A1 20010418; EP 1092186 A4 20050824; EP 1092186 B1 20100331; EP 2273393 A2 20110112; EP 2273393 A3 20121212; GB 0030380 D0 20010124; GB 0030382 D0 20010124; GB 2353923 A8 20010315; GB 2353923 A 20010307; GB 2357222 A 20010613; WO 9961984 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2013-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACCESS CO., LTD.

2009-12-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036708

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080409

2006-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101AFI20060209BHEP

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE