Global Patent Index - EP 1088433 A1

EP 1088433 A1 2001-04-04 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN GESICHERTES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SECURISER UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1088433 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00919529 A

Priority

  • US 0007588 W
  • US 12543799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057613A1] An apparatus and method creates a secure document with installed software at a sending location. The secure document includes an executable program which, when received and opened, runs a program that can decrypt the secure document. A pass word or phrase may be included to prevent unauthorized access to the secure document. A secure reply option may be provided which, if selected, permits the received program to encrypt a reply and to transmit the encrypted reply to the sending location. The installed software can then open the reply. In alternative embodiments, the executable program contacts a predetermined global computer network site which provides a program to decrypt the secure message. Further, the executable program and/or the program downloaded from the site enables communication with a second global computer network site which can be instructed to take a particular selected action. A confirmation can be returned to the sending location, either from the receiving location or from the second global computer network site.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 11/00 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G09C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/0428 (2013.01); H04L 63/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057613A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057613 A1 20000928; AU 4019900 A 20001009; BR 0005457 A 20010130; CN 1304610 A 20010718; DE 10080963 T1 20020725; EP 1088433 A1 20010404; JP 2002540679 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI