Global Patent Index - EP 1088439 A1

EP 1088439 A1 2001-04-04 - PROCEDURE AND SYSTEM FOR SETTING UP A TELECOMMUNICATION CONNECTION

Title (en)

PROCEDURE AND SYSTEM FOR SETTING UP A TELECOMMUNICATION CONNECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM AUFBAU EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDURE ET SYSTEME D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE CONNEXION TELEPHONIQUE

Publication

EP 1088439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931288 A

Priority

  • FI 9900514 W
  • FI 981369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966702A1] Procedure and system for setting up a call between a calling subscriber located in country (C1) and a called subscriber located in another country (C2), in a telecommunication system which comprises two telecommunication terminals, a telecommunication network and a telecommunication server. In the procedure and system of the invention, the calling subscriber sends a call setup message to the telecommunication server in the telecommunication network, the telecommunication server sets up a telecommunication connection to the calling subscriber and another telecommunication connection to the called subscriber, and the telecommunication server connects the two telecommunication connections so that a telecommunication connection from the called subscriber to the calling subscriber is established.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/88 (2013.01); H04M 3/42195 (2013.01); H04W 4/24 (2013.01); H04M 2203/2016 (2013.01); H04M 2203/652 (2013.01); H04M 2215/0116 (2013.01); H04M 2215/2026 (2013.01); H04M 2215/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966702A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966702 A1 19991223; AU 4784299 A 20000105; CN 1310910 A 20010829; DE 1088439 T1 20010705; EP 1088439 A1 20010404; ES 2155050 T1 20010501; FI 113441 B 20040415; FI 981369 A0 19980612; FI 981369 A 19991213; RU 2001101172 A 20021220

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA FINLAND OYJ

2001-07-05 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-06-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155050 T1

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE