Global Patent Index - EP 1088440 A1

EP 1088440 A1 2001-04-04 - DAA CIRCUITRY

Title (en)

DAA CIRCUITRY

Title (de)

DAA-SCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DAA

Publication

EP 1088440 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924456 A

Priority

  • US 9911377 W
  • US 9848998 A
  • US 9762198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966704A1] A digital direct access arrangement (DAA) circuitry (110) may be used to terminate the telephone connections at the user's end that provides a communication path for signals to and from the phone lines. Briefly described, the DAA (110) provides a programmable means for the DC termination (1617) for a variety of international phone standards. The invention may also be utilized with means for transmitting and receiving a signal across a capacitive isolation barrier (120). More particularly, a DC holding circuit is provided in which a programmable DC current limiting mode is available. In the current limiting mode, power may be dissipated in devices external to a DAA integrated circuit (110). Moreover, much of the power may be dissipated in external passive devices, such as resistors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 19/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 11/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966704 A1 19991223; AU 4095399 A 20000105; EP 1088440 A1 20010404; EP 1088440 A4 20050713; JP 2002518944 A 20020625; JP 4024477 B2 20071219; KR 100423246 B1 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090610

2008-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DAA CIRCUITRY

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060224

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060224

2005-07-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050527

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE