Global patent index - EP 1088492 A2

EP 1088492 A2 2001-04-04 - Spring-catch clasp

Title (en)

Spring-catch clasp

Title (de)

Federverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermoir à ressort

Publication

EP 1088492 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830634 A

Priority

IT FI990116 U

Abstract (en)

A spring-catch clasp for ornamental chains comprising a clasp body (1) fit for being connected to one end of a chain, and an annular member (5) extending therefrom and engageable with a female member mounted to the other end of the chain. The annular member is formed by an arm (5) extending between two expansions (3,4) of the clasp body and pivotally connected to the body through one end. Elastic means are provided between the end of the arm (5) and the clasp body (1) for forcing a free end of the arm against the respective expansion of the body, the arm (5) comprising means (8,9) for applying a force counteracting that of the elastic means to disengage the free end from its respective expansion and angularly displace the arm moving it away from the clasp body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/2038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088492 A2 20010404; EP 1088492 A3 20020904; IT 248315 Y1 20030128; IT FI990116 U1 20010329; IT FI990116 V0 19990929

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI