Global Patent Index - EP 1088501 A2

EP 1088501 A2 2001-04-04 - Support stand for displaying objects

Title (en)

Support stand for displaying objects

Title (de)

Trageinrichtung zur Präsentation von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour la présentation d'objets

Publication

EP 1088501 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120222 A

Priority

IT VI990085 U

Abstract (en)

Support stand (1) comprising two upright members (3, 4) basically vertical, spaced apart and facing each other, provided with overhanging members (3a, 4a) to hold removable shelves (5) and connected to each other by a pair of diagonal stays (6, 7) each of which is connected to both upright members (3, 4). Each diagonal stay (6, 7) has a first end (6a, 7a) attached by a hinge (8, 9) to the top part (3b, 4b)/bottom part (3c, 4c) of one of the uprights (3, 4) and a second end (6b, 7b), opposite the first, slidingly anchored to the bottom part (3c, 4c)/top part (3b, 4b) of the opposite upright member (4, 3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/00; A47F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/108 (2013.01); A47F 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088501 A2 20010404; EP 1088501 A3 20010627; IT 248663 Y1 20030212; IT VI990085 U1 20010329

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020212

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 5/00 A, 7A 47F 5/10 B, 7A 47B 43/00 B, 7A 47B 57/42 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI