Global Patent Index - EP 1088503 A2

EP 1088503 A2 2001-04-04 - Sheet assembly

Title (en)

Sheet assembly

Title (de)

Bettuchzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de draps

Publication

EP 1088503 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307865 A

Priority

GB 9923321 A

Abstract (en)

A sheet assembly (2) is provided which includes a base sheet element (4) for overlying a mattress and a cover sheet element (6) stitched to the base sheet element at a position spaced from one end thereof. The base sheet element includes a sleeping area portion (8) and a non-sleeping area portion (10), either of which individually may be overlaid by the cover sheet element. The sleeping area portion is spaced from the foot of the base sheet element and, together with the cover sheet element prevents a baby or young child from manoeuvring itself to the foot of the bed whereby it may become totally covered by the overlying bedding and overheat, possibly leading to cot death. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 15/00 (2006.01); A47G 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 15/008 (2013.01); A47G 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088503 A2 20010404; EP 1088503 A3 20020529; GB 9923321 D0 19991208

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47G 9/02 A, 7A 47D 15/00 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI