Global Patent Index - EP 1088507 A2

EP 1088507 A2 2001-04-04 - Vacuum cleaner with separation of waste

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner with separation of waste

Title (de)

Staubsauger mit Trennung von Abfällen

Title (fr)

Aspirateur à séparation de déchets

Publication

EP 1088507 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00420201 A

Priority

FR 9912532 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner with waste separator has a turbine forming an air flow (44) between a suction nozzle (20) and two collectors for waste. The air flow circuit has a Y-branch divided into an upstream branch (26) and a first downstream (50) branch opening connected to a fine particle collector and a second downstream branch (62) connected to a large waste collector. A screen (40) extends across the mouth of the upstream branch.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à un aspirateur comprenant une turbine ou autre dispositif générant un flux d'air (44) dans un circuit aéraulique entre une buse d'aspiration (20) et au moins deux lieux de collecte de déchets, ce circuit comprenant un dispositif de séparation entre des déchets grossiers et des particules fines, caractérisé en ce que, le circuit aéraulique comprend un embranchement en Y (30) subdivisant un conduit amont (26) en un premier conduit aval (50) débutant un premier circuit aval (52) en communication avec un lieu de rétention de particules fines et en un second conduit aval (60) débutant un second circuit aval (62) en communication avec un lieu de collecte (64) des déchets grossiers, et en ce que le dispositif de séparation comprend un tamis (40) agencé au travers de l'embouchure (32, 34) du premier conduit aval (50). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/10; A47L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2006.01); A47L 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/102 (2013.01); A47L 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088507 A2 20010404; EP 1088507 A3 20010822; FR 2799108 A1 20010406; FR 2799108 B3 20011123

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061103

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020123

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI