Global Patent Index - EP 1088588 A2

EP 1088588 A2 2001-04-04 - Catalytic support with stacked and/or wound metal sheets

Title (en)

Catalytic support with stacked and/or wound metal sheets

Title (de)

Katalysator-Trägerkörper mit gestapelten und/oder gewickelten Blechlagen

Title (fr)

Corps catalytique avec des couches de tôles empilées et/ou enroulées

Publication

EP 1088588 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115811 A

Priority

DE 19946462 A

Abstract (en)

Catalyst support has stacked and/or wound metal sheet layers (3) which are connected with its edge sections to a enveloping outer casing (2). The sheet layers in their central region (5b) have a lower wall thickness than in their outer region (5a) lying on or near to the outer casing. An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of the metal sheet layers comprising rolling the central regions of the sheet layers thinner than in the edge regions.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Katalysator-Trägerkörper mit gestapelten und/oder gewickelten Blechlagen, die mit ihren Randabschnitten mit einem einhüllenden Außenmantel stoffschlüssig verbunden sind, und wobei die Blechlagen in ihrem Mittenbereich, der vom Außenmantel beabstandet ist, eine geringere Wandstärke / Dicke aufweisen als in ihrem Außenbereich, der am oder nahe des Außenmantels liegt. Bevorzugt besitzt der Katalysator-Trägerkörper einen im wesentlichen kreisförmigem Querschnitt, wobei die Blechlagen S-förmig gewickelt sind und deren Randbereiche in einem Ringbereich liegen, der an den Außenmantel anschließend bis zum 0,1-fachen des Trägerkörper-Durchmessers breit ist. Ein derartiger Trägerkörper weist eine ausreichende mechanische Festigkeit und gleichzeitig einen geringen Strömungswiderstand sowie eine niedrige Wärmekapazität auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 35/04; B01D 53/94; F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 3/281 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19946462 A1 20010329; EP 1088588 A2 20010404; EP 1088588 A3 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI