Global Patent Index - EP 1088594 A2

EP 1088594 A2 2001-04-04 - Method and device for spraying a moving fibrous web

Title (en)

Method and device for spraying a moving fibrous web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Besprühen einer bewegten Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de pulvérisation d'un produit sur une nappe fibreuse en défilement

Publication

EP 1088594 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116349 A

Priority

DE 19946479 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly to spray the surface of a moving paper or cardboard web (12) has a jet (14) which sprays an adjustable vol. of the coating medium (16) on to the web surface. A pulsation valve (20) is in the feed of the medium to the jet, where the flow pulsations are damped or weakened. The vol. flow to the jet (14) is set by the pulsation valve (20), which is an armature or plate armature valve. The pulsations in the vol. flow of the coating medium (16) to the jet (14) are suppressed by a pulsation damper (18) in front of the jet (14) and/or by the use of a jet (14) with a larger jet width in the direction (L) of web travel and/or by the use of a flexible feed conduit to the jet (14). The jet width along the direction (L) of web travel can be 30% of the width across the web line and preferably 50% of the lateral width. The jet (14) is preferably an elliptical flat-stream jet, oriented at an angle to the web (12) to spray the surface against the direction (L) of web travel at 80 degrees and preferably 70 degrees . The jet is suitable for webs (12) moving at speeds of 1200 m/min. and preferably 1500 m/min. The jet (14) can also be a solid cone jet. The vol. flow is set by the pulsation valve (20) using pulse width modulation. The pulsation valve is controlled at a constant cycle frequency. An Independent claim is included for a web coating assembly (10) with a jet (14) to spray the web (12) surface with a coating medium (16). At least one pulsation valve (20) in the flow feed with units (18,14) to dampen or weaken pulsations in the medium flow.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Besprühen einer bewegten Faserstoffbahn 12, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, mittels wenigstens einer Düse 14 wird der Düse 14 ein vorzugsweise einstellbarer Volumenstrom des betreffenden Sprühmediums 16 über wenigstens ein Pulsationsventil 20 zugeführt, wobei im Volumenstrom des Sprühmediums 16 auftretende Pulsationen vorzugsweise gedämpft oder abgeschwächt werden. Es wird auch eine entsprechende, eine Düse 14 sowie wenigstens ein Pulsationsventil 20 umfassende Vorrichtung beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/30 (2006.01); B05B 9/03 (2006.01); D21G 7/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/50 (2006.01); B05B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/03 (2013.01); B05B 1/30 (2013.01); D21G 7/00 (2013.01); D21H 23/50 (2013.01); B05B 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19946479 A1 20010329; EP 1088594 A2 20010404; EP 1088594 A3 20030827; EP 1088594 B1 20050323; US 6444090 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120729

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 12/06 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7D 21G 7/00 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 1/30 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI