Global Patent Index - EP 1088600 A1

EP 1088600 A1 2001-04-04 - Aligning device for document feeder

Title (en)

Aligning device for document feeder

Title (de)

Ausrichtvorrichtung für Dokumentzuführvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de taquage pour alimenteur de documents

Publication

EP 1088600 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402690 A

Priority

FR 9912309 A

Abstract (en)

Postal wedging device has a first back wedge stop (16) and a second (18) perpendicular to the direction of post movement. Each stop can be moved in a groove (20, 22) to hold a postal item. The back stop (16) groove is inclined relative to the postage direction so that the wedge stop (16) is positioned in the center of the smallest dimension of the post.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de laquage pour un alimenteur d'une machine de traitement de courrier, comportant une première butée de taquage arrière (16) mobile selon une direction de défilement des articles de courrier et une seconde butée de laquage latéral (18) mobile selon une direction perpendiculaire à cette direction de défilement, chaque butée de laquage pouvant être déplacée dans une rainure respective (20, 22). La rainure (20) associée à la butée de taquage arrière est inclinée d'un angle a déterminé par rapport à la direction de défilement des articles de courrier, de telle sorte que la butée de taquage arrière reste sensiblement centrée sur la petite dimension de l'article de courrier quel que soit le format de cet article. De préférence, la butée de laquage arrière (16) présente une forme de cale à au moins deux pentes successives, une première pente à inclinaison réduite (160) et une seconde pente à inclinaison forte (162). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/06; B43M 3/04; B43M 5/04; B43M 7/00; B65H 1/06; B65H 9/04; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/06 (2006.01); B65H 9/04 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); B65H 1/06 (2013.01); B65H 9/04 (2013.01); B65H 2511/10 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/10 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/04

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088600 A1 20010404; EP 1088600 B1 20030604; DE 60003135 D1 20030710; DE 60003135 T2 20040108; FR 2799141 A1 20010406; FR 2799141 B1 20020125; US 6523822 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003135 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GALTIER, OLIVIER

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELFOSSE, LAURENT

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GALTIER, OLIVIER

2001-07-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DELFOSSE, LAURENT

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI