Global Patent Index - EP 1088607 A1

EP 1088607 A1 2001-04-04 - Apparatus for, and method of, moulding an article

Title (en)

Apparatus for, and method of, moulding an article

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Umformen eines Werkstückes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de formage d'une pièce

Publication

EP 1088607 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00308459 A

Priority

GB 9922965 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for, and method of, moulding an article (5) from a sheet of material (9), wherein the apparatus comprises a mould formed of a plurality of mould members (3). The sheet of material is pre-formed and is disposed on the seat (10) of the fixed table (7) of a hydraulic press. The mould members are then moved over the table to close the mould around the pre-formed sheet, such that a bottom portion (14) of each mould member holds the periphery (21) of the sheet against the surface (19) of the table. A mould clamp (2) is then lowered onto the mould members by means of the moveable table (1) of the hydraulic press. The mould clamp biases the mould members against the table and freezes the clamp in the closed position. Fluid is then introduced into the mould at high pressure from below the pre-formed sheet to force the pre-formed sheet against the internal surface of the mould thereby moulding the article. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/025 (2011.01); B21D 26/029 (2011.01); B21D 26/031 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/025 (2013.01); B21D 26/02 (2013.01); B21D 26/029 (2013.01); B21D 26/031 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088607 A1 20010404; GB 2354730 A 20010404; GB 2354730 B 20010912; GB 9922965 D0 19991201

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIORINI S.P.A

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2002-05-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2002-05-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI