Global patent index - EP 1088610 A1

EP 1088610 A1 2001-04-04 - Process and device for the production of continuously cast steel products

Title (en)

Process and device for the production of continuously cast steel products

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von stranggegossenen Stahlerzeugnissen sowie Stranggiessvorrichtung hierzu

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la production d'un produit en acier coulé en continu

Publication

EP 1088610 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121082 A

Priority

DE 19946549 A

Abstract (en)

Production of continuous cast steel products in a continuous casting device comprises casting the strand having an elevation on one side as a function of the mold, and back rolling the elevation during strand deformation in the region of residual solidification whilst the deforming device produces a force in the inside of the strand to seal the core. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for continuously casting steel comprising a mold and deforming devices arranged along the continuous casting strip and moving towards each other to deform the cast product. One side of the mold has a profile for producing an elevation over the length of the strand at the height of the core.

Abstract (de)

Um stranggegossene Stahlerzeugnisse herzustellen, die einen verminderten Grad an Kernseigerungen und einen hohen Kernverdichtungsgrad aufweisen, wird der Strang mit mindestens einer einseitigen Profilüberhöhung (5, 6, 7, 8a, 8b) als Funktion der Kokillenform vergossen und während der sich anschließenden Strangverformung im Bereich der Resterstarrung die jeweilige Profilüberhöhung zurückgewalzt, indem das Verformungsmittel (2, 3) über die jeweilige Profilüberhöhung eine gerichtete Krafteinleitung in das Stranginnere zur Kernverdichtung bewirkt. Gleichzeitig wird eine entsprechende Vorrichtung vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5348075 A 19940920 - PERRY ROBERT M [GB], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 351 (M - 1003) 30 July 1990 (1990-07-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088610 A1 20010404; DE 19946549 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI