Global Patent Index - EP 1088622 A2

EP 1088622 A2 2001-04-04 - Platen with web release apparatus

Title (en)

Platen with web release apparatus

Title (de)

Platte mit Polierkissen Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Plateau avec dispositif de sustentation du tampon de polissage

Publication

EP 1088622 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121213 A

Priority

US 15730399 P

Abstract (en)

Generally, a method and apparatus for releasing polishing material in a polishing system. In one embodiment, the apparatus includes a platen having one or more nozzles coupled thereto. The platen has a support surface adapted to support the polishing material. The nozzles are adapted to flow a fluid therethrough that places the polishing material in a spaced-apart relation to the platen. In another embodiment, the one or more nozzles further include a centerline that forms an acute angle with the support surface. In one embodiment, the method includes the steps of supporting at least a portion of the polishing material on the platen, supplying a fluid between the polishing material, and lifting the polishing material to a spaced-apart relation to the platen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04; B24B 41/04; B24B 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 21/04 (2006.01); B24B 21/18 (2006.01); B24B 37/30 (2012.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/30 (2013.01); B24B 21/04 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01); B24B 57/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088622 A2 20010404; EP 1088622 A3 20030903; JP 2001156031 A 20010608; TW 472315 B 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI