Global Patent Index - EP 1088625 A2

EP 1088625 A2 2001-04-04 - Screw driving tool

Title (en)

Screw driving tool

Title (de)

Schraubendreherwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil pour tourner des vis

Publication

EP 1088625 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120985 A

Priority

DE 19947555 A

Abstract (en)

The screwdriver has a shaft with an engagement section (3,4) at each end, to engage a screw. At least one engagement section has a constant cross-sectional form along its length, which has a varying orientation. Preferably, the two engagement sections have different lengths and different profile formations or surface areas, and have different orientations of their cross-sections.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schraubendreherwerkzeug enthält einen Schaft, der als beispielsweise runder Stab ausgebildet ist. Der Schaft kann geradlinig oder abgewinkelt verlaufen. An jedem seiner beiden Enden enthält er einen Eingriffsabschnitt zum Eingriff in eine Antriebsausbildung einer Schraube. Beide Eingriffsabschnitte weisen eine konstante Querschnittsform auf, die über die Länge des Eingriffabschnitts aber leicht tordiert verläuft. Beide Eingriffsabschnitte haben bei gleichem Nennmaß eine geringfügig unterschiedliche Flächengröße. Mit dem einem Eingriffsabschnitt wird ein spielarmer Eingriff in die Antriebsausbildung der Schraube erreicht, während der andere Eingriffsabschnitt einen spielfreien Eingriff ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088625 A2 20010404; EP 1088625 A3 20011128; DE 19947555 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI