Global patent index - EP 1088626 A2

EP 1088626 A2 2001-04-04 - Method and device for position assurance of screw-/nut-connections

Title (en)

Method and device for position assurance of screw-/nut-connections

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lagesicherung einer Schrauben-/Mutter-Verbindung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour assurer la position de connections vis/écrou

Publication

EP 1088626 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118409 A

Priority

DE 19946401 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using an operation tool with at least one opening perpendicular to the screw axis to positively fit a securing unit. The nut or screw is moved about and along the screw axis by the tool. The opening in the screw and nut connection is detected by a sensor. The screw and nut connection is secured in an aligned self-locking position. The securing unit is positively fitted into the opening, to lock the screw and nut connection. An Independent claim is included for a device for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Lagesicherung einer Schrauben-/Mutterverbindung. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine produktionsstabile, formschlüssige Lagesicherung einer Schrauben-/Mutterverbindung zu schaffen, bei der gleichzeitig der Montageaufwand reduziert ist. Gelöst wird das dadurch, indem an einem Betätigungswerkzeug 8 ein Lageerkennungssystem 13 angeordnet ist, welches schaltungstechnisch mit einer Versorgungs-/Auswerteeinheit gekoppelt ist, wobei eine fluchtende Lage zweier Öffnungen 6, 7 mittels Lageerkennungssystem 13 sensorisch erfassbar und ein Signal generierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/08 (2006.01); B25B 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/20 (2013.01); B25B 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3151265 A1 19830714 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088626 A2 20010404; EP 1088626 A3 20030326; DE 19946401 A1 20010503; DE 19946401 C2 20011220

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030927

2004-03-03 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: MITTEILUNG NACH REGEL 85A UND 85B EPUE

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-08-13 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: MITTEILUNG NACH REGEL 50 EPUE AN DIE ZAHLUNG DER BENENNUNGSGEBUEHREN (ART. 79(2)EPUE) SOWIE DER PRUEFUNGSGEBUEHR (ART94(2) EPUE)

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 25B 27/20 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 25B 27/08 B

2001-10-10 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SCHULTE-BUNERT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI