Global Patent Index - EP 1088636 A3

EP 1088636 A3 2002-09-18 - Apparatus for deburring ceramic products, particularly glazed tiles

Title (en)

Apparatus for deburring ceramic products, particularly glazed tiles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entgraten von keramischen Gegenständen , insbesondere von Glasierten Fliesen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour ébavurer des articles en céramique , en particulier des carreaux émaillés

Publication

EP 1088636 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00120204 A

Priority

IT MO990204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1088636A2] An apparatus (1) for deburring ceramic products, particularly glazed tiles (P), advancing on a conveyance line (2), comprises a frame (3) for supporting means (4) for abrading the edges of the products, the means being arranged laterally to the line, and a tray for containing a fluid which is arranged below the abrading means, the abrading means being flexible, actuatable with respect to the products (P) and partially immersed in the tray (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/06 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 11/18 (2013.01); B24B 9/06 (2013.01); B24B 21/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 6915399 U 19690807 - NETZSCH MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]
  • [A] DE 631667 C 19360625 - PORZELLANFABRIK KAHLA
  • [A] GB 1450804 A 19760929 - HEATH SON UK LTD G H
  • [A] DE 3913378 C1 19901004
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 198848, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P64, AN 1988-345255, XP002196665
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 024 (C - 677) 18 January 1990 (1990-01-18)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 362 (C - 0971) 5 August 1992 (1992-08-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088636 A2 20010404; EP 1088636 A3 20020918; IT 1310842 B1 20020222; IT MO990204 A1 20010328; IT MO990204 D0 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI