Global Patent Index - EP 1088654 A1

EP 1088654 A1 2001-04-04 - Printing machine

Title (en)

Printing machine

Title (de)

Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1088654 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00120258 A

Priority

JP 27776299 A

Abstract (en)

A printing machine includes an impression cylinder (31) on which a sheet (100) is held; an intaglio cylinder (32) in contact with a lower portion of the impression cylinder (31) and adapted to print on the sheet (100) in cooperation with the impression cylinder (31); an ink collection cylinder (33), chablon rollers (34a to 34c), and ink supplying units (35a to 35c) provided for supplying ink to the intaglio cylinder (32); pile tables (47) on which the printed sheets (100) are piled; and a chain (44) capable of traveling and having gripper bars 45 for transporting the sheets (100) from the impression cylinder (31) to the pile tables (47). The pile tables (47) are disposed above the ink collection cylinder (33), the chablon rollers (34a to 34c), and the ink supplying units (35a to 35c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/00; B41F 21/08; B41F 31/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/70 (2006.01); B41F 21/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/302 (2013.01); B41F 13/0024 (2013.01); B41F 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088654 A1 20010404; JP 2001096713 A 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040628

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI