Global Patent Index - EP 1088661 A2

EP 1088661 A2 2001-04-04 - Method and device for decorating individual articles

Title (en)

Method and device for decorating individual articles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Dekorieren von Einzelobjekten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de décoration d'objets individuels

Publication

EP 1088661 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120347 A

Priority

DE 19946823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6478485B1] In a process and apparatus for decorating an article, printing ink or electrostatic charges is or are applied in dependence on a digital program in dot form to the article carried by a holder, with individual dots going together to at least form a partial pattern or image. In the case of the latent pattern formed by electrostatic charges, it is then brought into contact with ink particles to form the decoration. In both cases the article is transported along a transportation path through at least one print station provided with an inkjet print head or an ionographic print head, the print head being controllable in dependence on the digital program. The individual nozzles or the electrodes of the respective print head are actuated in accordance with the digital program which is called up for example in dependence on the transportation movement of the article.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Dekorieren eines Objektes, bei welchem Druckfarbe oder elektrostatische Ladungen in Abhängigkeit von einem digitalen Programm punktförmig auf dem von einer Halterung getragenen Objekt aufgebracht wird und einzelne Punkte sich wenigstens zu einem Teilmuster ergänzen. Im Fall des durch elektrostatische Ladungen gebildeten latenten Muster wird dieses dann mit die Dekoration bildenden Farbpartikeln in Kontakt gebracht. In beiden Fällen wird das zu bedruckende Objekt entlang einer Transportbahn durch wenigstens eine Druckstation hindurchbewegt, die mit einem in Abhängigkeit von einem digitalen Programm steuerbaren Inkjet-Druckkopf oder einem ionografischen Druckkopf versehen ist. Die einzelnen Düsen bzw. Elektroden werden entsprechend dem digitalen Programm, welches z. B. in Abhängigkeit von der Transportbewegung des Objektes abgerufen wird, betätigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/4071 (2013.01); B41J 2/01 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01); Y10S 101/37 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088661 A2 20010404; EP 1088661 A3 20011121; EP 1088661 B1 20070815; DE 19946823 A1 20010405; DE 50014563 D1 20070927; US 2002012556 A1 20020131; US 6478485 B1 20021112; US 6536346 B2 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014563

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAMMANN MASCHINENBAU GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WERNER KAMMANN MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH, 32257 BUENDE, DE

- Document: DE 50014563

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080516

2007-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014563 P 20070927

2007-08-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WERNER KAMMANN MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/01 A, 7G 03G 15/00 B, 7B 41J 2/415 B

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/01 A, 7G 03G 15/00 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI