Global Patent Index - EP 1088725 A1

EP 1088725 A1 2001-04-04 - Brake body

Title (en)

Brake body

Title (de)

Bremsenkörper

Title (fr)

Corps de frein

Publication

EP 1088725 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120674 A

Priority

DE 19945137 A

Abstract (en)

The brake body rotates with the wheel when installed and absorbs frictional forces during braking. At least one first detector element in one piece with the brake body interacts with at least second detector element that does not rotate with the wheel. The first element(s) is connected to the brake body via a spoke not in the path of the braking force from the braking body to the wheel. The brake body (1) rotates with the wheel when installed and absorbs frictional forces during braking. At least one first element (3) in one piece with the brake body forms a detection device (3,7) for detecting the revolution rate and/or direction of the wheel and interacts with at least a second element (7) of the detection device that does not rotate with the wheel. The first element(s) is connected to the brake body via a spoke (4) that does not lie in the path of the braking force from the braking body to the wheel.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Bremsenkörper (1,1.1) für eine Bremse eines Rades beschrieben, wobei der Bremsenkörper (1,1.1) sich in eingebautem Zustand mit dem Rade dreht und beim Bremsen Reibkräfte aufnimmt und einstückig mit dem Bremsenkörper (1,1.1) mindestens ein erstes Element (2,3) einer Erfassungsvorrichtung zum Erfassen der Drehzahl und/oder der Richtung des Rades ausgebildet ist, das mit mindestens einem zweiten, nicht mit dem Rade drehenden Element (7) der Erfassungsvorrichtung zusammenwirkt. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß das mindestens eine erste Element (2,3) über mindestens eine Speiche (4) mit dem Bremsenkörper (1,1.1) verbunden ist, die nicht im Bremskraftfluß von dem Bremsenkörper (1,1.1) zu dem Rade liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 8/00; F16D 65/12; G01P 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/12 (2006.01); G01P 3/44 (2006.01); G01P 3/487 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/12 (2013.01); G01P 3/443 (2013.01); G01P 3/487 (2013.01); F16D 2065/1308 (2013.01); F16D 2065/1328 (2013.01); F16D 2065/1332 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088725 A1 20010404; EP 1088725 B1 20040714; DE 19945137 A1 20010412; DE 19945137 B4 20050721

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090921

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090921

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007050 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI