Global patent index - EP 1088729 A1

EP 1088729 A1 2001-04-04 - Constrained guide urban transport system

Title (en)

Constrained guide urban transport system

Title (de)

Zwangsgeführtes Nahverkehrssystem

Title (fr)

Système de transport urbain avec guidage forcé

Publication

EP 1088729 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00203340 A

Priority

IT MI992050 A

Abstract (en)

A constrained guide urban transport system (11), including numerous stations among which at least one ring-closed guide (14) is located which supports the mutually spaced vehicles (12). A cable (15) runs along the guide (14) which is driven in translation by a winch (16) placed within a tractor station and sent to a transmission station. Along each runway all of the stations have acceleration or deceleration conveyors (18) in order to accelerate the vehicles (12) leaving the stations to bring them to a synchronous speed with a cable speed (15) and in order to brake the vehicles (12) arriving into the station to a minimum speed or to a halt, to allow for the passengers of the vehicles (12) to get on and/or off. The vehicles (12) have clamps (17) aimed at grasping the cable (15) when the vehicle (12) moves away from the station and moves towards another station and aimed at releasing the cable (15) when the vehicle (12) moves towards a station and is led by the acceleration or deceleration conveyors (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 9/00; B61L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2006.01); B61L 3/00 (2006.01); B61L 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/005 (2013.01); B61B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088729 A1 20010404; EP 1088729 B1 20050420; AT 293554 T 20050515; CA 2321338 A1 20010401; CA 2321338 C 20081125; DE 60019520 D1 20050525; DE 60019520 T2 20060223; DK 1088729 T3 20050822; ES 2241545 T3 20051101; IT 1313913 B1 20020926; IT MI992050 A1 20010402; IT MI992050 D0 19991001; PT 1088729 E 20050930

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-08-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

2009-01-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20051222

2006-04-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20051222

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2241545

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-09-26 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2005-08-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050402234

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-08-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-08-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60019520

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI