Global patent index - EP 1088754 A2

EP 1088754 A2 2001-04-04 - Composite helicopter rotor yoke

Title (en)

Composite helicopter rotor yoke

Title (de)

Hubschrauberrotorarm aus Faserverbundstoff

Title (fr)

Etrier pour rotor d'hélicoptère en matériaux composites

Publication

EP 1088754 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203352 A

Priority

US 40769199 A

Abstract (en)

The protective edge member (51, 53) for use on a composite flexure, such as a helicopter main rotor yoke (11), having an exposed edge surface (24), comprises an innermost composite ply (57) attached to the exposed edge surface (24), an outermost composite ply (59) attached to the innermost composite ply (57); and at least one interior composite ply (55) disposed between the innermost composite ply (57) and the outermost composite ply (59). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64C 27/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/35 (2006.01); B64C 27/33 (2006.01); B64C 27/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 27/33 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49318 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49337 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24785 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088754 A2 20010404; EP 1088754 A3 20020403; EP 1088754 B1 20030326; CA 2320606 A1 20010328; CA 2320606 C 20090224; DE 1088754 T1 20011011; DE 60001784 D1 20030430; DE 60001784 T2 20031204; JP 2001122195 A 20010508; KR 100726201 B1 20070611; KR 20010050665 A 20010615; US 6375426 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60001784

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020323

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-06-29 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI