Global Patent Index - EP 1088756 A2

EP 1088756 A2 2001-04-04 - Folding-box conveyor with a closing device for the closing tabs of a folding box

Title (en)

Folding-box conveyor with a closing device for the closing tabs of a folding box

Title (de)

Faltschachtelförderer mit Verschlussvorrichtung für die Verschlusslaschen einer Faltschachtel

Title (fr)

Transporteur pour boîtes pliantes avec un dispositif de fermeture pour les pattes de fermeture d'une boîte pliante

Publication

EP 1088756 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108146 A

Priority

DE 19920900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920900A1] The packing machine has a conveyer for erect cartons and a closure unit (10) which presents and inserts the carton locking tabs. The closure unit incorporates a tool (36) which is operated by a rotating powered drive with gear. The gear is especially a planetary gear (30) linked to an intermediate shaft which is surrounded by a hollow coaxial drive shaft. The outer shaft does not rotate with respect to the inner shaft, but does slide axially back and forth.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verpackungsmaschine weist einen Faltschachtelförderer und eine Verschlußvorrichtung (10) zum Ausrichten und Einstecken der Verschlußlaschen einer Faltschachtel auf, wobei die Verschlußvorrichtung zumindest ein Verschlußwerkzeug (36) trägt, das mittels eines Antriebs und eines Getriebes eine Drehung unter Beibehaltung seiner Ausrichtung ausführt. Um auch bei hohen Taktzahlen der Verpackungsmaschine einen präzisen Bewegungsablauf der Verschlußwerkzeuge zu gewährleisten, ist das Getriebe als Planetengetriebe (30) ausgestaltet. Dabei kann der Planetenträger mit einer Zwischenwelle verbunden sein, die von einer koaxial angeordneten Antriebshohlwelle umgeben ist, wobei die Antriebshohlwelle relativ zu der Zwischenwelle drehfest, jedoch axial verschieblich gelagert ist, so daß eine axiale oder vertikale Verstellung des Planetengetriebes und somit der Verschlußwerkzeuge möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 7/22; B65B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/20 (2006.01); B65B 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 7/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920900 A1 20001109; EP 1088756 A2 20010404; EP 1088756 A3 20050406; JP 2000326905 A 20001128; US 6381923 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051007

2006-02-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 7/22 A

2005-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 7/20 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI