Global Patent Index - EP 1088758 A2

EP 1088758 A2 2001-04-04 - Method and device for checking the contour of finished packages

Title (en)

Method and device for checking the contour of finished packages

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Prüfen der Kontur von fertigen Packungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour contrôler le contour d'emballages terminés

Publication

EP 1088758 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120336 A

Priority

DE 19946932 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves moving the packages (2) through a closed light curtain (4), at least in the region of their external width sections, and generating nn electrical signal if the received light quantity differs from that expected for a defined package size to enable separation of the corresponding package. Packages can be passed through one or two light curtains. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for testing the contours of manufactured packages.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Konturenprüfung von Zigarettenpackungen, insbesondere zum Erfassen schlecht verklebter abstehender Seitenlaschen der Zigarettenpackungen. Es wird vorgeschlagen, die Zigarettenpackungen (2) durch einen zwischen einem Lichtsender (6) und einem Lichtempfänger (7) erzeugten geschlossenen Lichtvorhang (4) hindurchzubewegen, dessen empfangene Lichtmenge durch abstehende Verpackungsteile (8) entsprechend reduziert und als Fehlersignal interpretiert wird, welches zur Aussonderung der fehlerhaften Zigarettenpackung verwertet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/02 (2006.01); B31B 1/74 (2006.01); B65B 19/28 (2006.01); B65B 19/30 (2006.01); B65B 57/02 (2006.01); B65B 57/04 (2006.01); G01N 21/95 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088758 A2 20010404; EP 1088758 A3 20020116; CN 1290635 A 20010411; DE 19946932 A1 20010405; JP 2001165626 A 20010622; PL 342801 A1 20010409; US 6396017 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020622

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI